MA H4283 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4488
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges
Title
Financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4488 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 15, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2024 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-25 | House | Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4013 (Similar To) 2023-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2023
H3547 (Similar To) 2023-07-26 - Accompanied H4013
H3546 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - New draft substituted, see H3547
H4488 (Replaced by) 2024-04-03 - New draft substituted, see H4529
H4529 (Similar To) 2024-05-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2024
H3547 (Similar To) 2023-07-26 - Accompanied H4013
H3546 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - New draft substituted, see H3547
H4488 (Replaced by) 2024-04-03 - New draft substituted, see H4529
H4529 (Similar To) 2024-05-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4283.pdf |