MA H4289 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4269
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on December 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - See H4269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - See H4269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the message from His Excellency the Governor returning the engrossed Bill relative to immediate COVID-19 recovery needs (see House, No. 4269) as relates to Attachments A through C, for items returned with disapproval of wording under the provisions of Section 5 of Article LXIII and section returned with recommendation of amendment under the provisions of Article LVI of the Amendments to the Constitution (House, No. 4289). December 16, 2021
Title
So much of the message from His Excellency the Governor returning the engrossed Bill relative to immediate COVID-19 recovery needs (see House, No. 4269) as relates to Attachments A through C, for items returned with disapproval of wording under the provisions of Section 5 of Article LXIII and section returned with recommendation of amendment under the provisions of Article LVI of the Amendments to the Constitution (House, No. 4289). December 16, 2021
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-16 | House | See H4269 |
Same As/Similar To
H4269 (Replaced by) 2021-12-16 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4288 for section 72
S2242 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2908
S2246 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H4218 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Adopted
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H3862 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Published as amended, see H3871
S2242 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2908
S2246 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H4218 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Adopted
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H3862 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Published as amended, see H3871
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4289 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4289.pdf |