MA H4269 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-16 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4288 for section 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-16 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4288 for section 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to immediate COVID-19 recovery needs (House, No. 4234, published as amended), reports recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 4269).
Title
Relative to immediate COVID-19 recovery needs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-16 | House | For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4288 for section 72 |
2021-12-16 | House | For message, see H4289 |
2021-12-16 | House | Governor returned to the House with vetoes and amendments to certain sections |
2021-12-13 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 102 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-12-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-12-03 | House | Enacted |
2021-12-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-12-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-12-03 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2021-12-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-12-02 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2021-12-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-12-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2021-12-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported on H4234 |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H4234 (Replaced by) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
H4219 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Published as amended, see H4234
H3922 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4289 (Replaced by) 2021-12-16 - See H4269
H4288 (Replaced by) 2022-05-26 - Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2022
H4340 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Published as amended, see H4345
H4345 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14
H4219 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Published as amended, see H4234
H3922 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4289 (Replaced by) 2021-12-16 - See H4269
H4288 (Replaced by) 2022-05-26 - Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2022
H4340 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Published as amended, see H4345
H4345 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4269 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4269.pdf |