MA H4345 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House bill No. 4340, as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. January 19, 2022.
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #124 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14 |
2022-03-30 | House | For message, see H4458 |
2022-02-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-02-12 | House | Governor returned to the House with vetoes and amendments to certain sections |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-02-03 | House | Enacted |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-02-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House further amendment |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-03 | House | Further amendment adopted, see H4430 |
2022-02-03 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2022-02-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #124 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2626 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read third |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2622, amended |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read second |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 26, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2622 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-01-19 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 128 ) |
2022-01-19 | House | H4340, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4340 (Replaces) 2022-01-20 - Published as amended, see H4345
H4269 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4288 for section 72
H4219 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Published as amended, see H4234
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
H3922 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2626 (Replaces) 2022-01-26 - See H4345
H4430 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Text of a further amendment, see H4345
H4458 (Replaced by) 2022-03-30 - See H4345
H4456 (Replaced by) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4457 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4269 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4288 for section 72
H4219 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Published as amended, see H4234
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
H3922 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2626 (Replaces) 2022-01-26 - See H4345
H4430 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Text of a further amendment, see H4345
H4458 (Replaced by) 2022-03-30 - See H4345
H4456 (Replaced by) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4457 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken