MA H4457 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4345
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Section 30 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (see House, No. 4345, amended), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment D of House, No. 4458). February 12, 2022.
Title
Providing for a comprehensive COVID-19 vaccination equity plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-03-30 | House | For message, see H4458, Attachment D |
2022-03-30 | House | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment |
2022-03-30 | House | Enacted as section 30 of H4345 |
Same As/Similar To
H4345 (Replaced by) 2022-03-30 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
H4578 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
H4458 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - See H4345
H4456 (Similar To) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4532 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Published as amended, see H4578
H4882 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - See H4296
H5110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5180 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5182 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5183 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
H4578 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
H4458 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - See H4345
H4456 (Similar To) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4532 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Published as amended, see H4578
H4882 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - See H4296
H5110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5180 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5182 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5183 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4457 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4457.pdf |