MA H4882 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4296
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - See H4296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - See H4296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | See H4296 |
Same As/Similar To
H4296 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H3921 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4296
H3919 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2022
H5152 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - See H5106
H5181 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - See H5163
H4456 (Similar To) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4457 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H3921 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4296
H3919 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2022
H5152 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - See H5106
H5181 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - See H5163
H4456 (Similar To) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4457 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4882 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4882.pdf |