MA H4578 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House bill No. 4532, as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. March 9, 2022.
Title
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2022 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - House - House Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 ) |
2022-05-26 | House | Committee reported, in each instance, that the matter be scheduled for consideration; and Rule 7A suspended, in each instance |
2022-05-26 | House | The following items and sections severally reported from committee on House Ways and Means recommending, in each instance, that the action of the General Court stand; and the items and sections severally were referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-05-26 | House | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-05-16 | House | For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4677 for section 38 |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-05-16 | House | For message, see H4678 |
2022-04-04 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-04-01 | Governor returned to the House with disapproval of section 73 and with an amendment to section 38 | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-03-31 | House | Enacted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the further House amendment |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, see House document numbered 4650 |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2793 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2776 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read second |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2776 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 155 ) |
2022-03-09 | House | H4532, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4532 (Replaces) 2022-03-09 - Published as amended, see H4578
S2793 (Replaces) 2022-03-24 - See H4578
H4678 (Replaced by) 2022-05-16 - See H4578
H4677 (Replaced by) 2022-06-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2022
H4479 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2793 (Replaces) 2022-03-24 - See H4578
H4678 (Replaced by) 2022-05-16 - See H4578
H4677 (Replaced by) 2022-06-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2022
H4479 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken