MA H4219 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4218
Note: Legislation replaced by H4234
Note: Legislation replaced by H4234
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-02 - Published as amended, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-02 - Published as amended, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to immediate COVID-19 recovery needs
Title
Relative to immediate COVID-19 recovery needs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-29 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - House Consolidated amendment B (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - House Consolidated amendment A (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House and Miscellaneous) adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Infrastructure) adopted - 158 YEAS to 1 NAYS (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - House Consolidated amendment B (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - House Consolidated amendment A (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House and Miscellaneous) adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Infrastructure) adopted - 158 YEAS to 1 NAYS (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | House | Published as amended, see H4234 |
2021-10-29 | House | Amendment 1127 adopted |
2021-10-29 | House | Consolidated amendment D (Economic Development, Workforce and Miscellaneous) adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 113 ) |
2021-10-29 | House | Consolidated amendment C (Environment/Climate and Infrastructure) adopted - 158 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 112 ) |
2021-10-28 | House | Consolidated amendment B (Health and Human Services and Education) adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS ( See YEA and NAY No. 111 ) |
2021-10-28 | House | Consolidated amendment A (Housing and Food Security) adopted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 110 ) |
2021-10-28 | House | Read third |
2021-10-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | House | Order adopted, see H4218 |
2021-10-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-10-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-25 | House | Reported on a part of H3922 |
2021-10-25 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4218 (Replaced by) 2021-10-25 - Adopted
H3922 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
H4234 (Replaced by) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4269 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4288 for section 72
H4340 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Published as amended, see H4345
H4345 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14
H3922 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
H4234 (Replaced by) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4269 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4288 for section 72
H4340 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Published as amended, see H4345
H4345 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14