MA H431 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to place a moratorium on high stakes testing and to direct the State Auditor to investigate the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education. Education.
Title
To place a moratorium on high stakes testing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S273 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S275 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S273 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S275 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H431 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H431.pdf |