MA H4316 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4306
Note: Replaces legislation S2310
Note: Replaces legislation S2310
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - See H4374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - See H4374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local housing authorities House bill No. 4306, as changed by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading, and as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. July 16, 2014.
Title
Relative to local housing authorities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | House | See H4374 |
2014-07-30 | House | Reported by committee of conference |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed, (Eldridge-Brewer-Tarr), in concurrence |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendments |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-29 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Honan-Fox-Wong) |
2014-07-29 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #422 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2310 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Read third |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2292, amended |
2014-07-24 | Senate | For Senate actions see S2292 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 24, 2014 |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Bill recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2292 |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-07-16 | House | H4306, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4306 (Replaces) 2014-07-16 - Published as amended, see H4316
S2310 (Replaces) 2014-07-24 - See H4316
S2310 (Replaces) 2014-07-24 - See H4316
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4316 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4316.pdf |