MA H4317 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 325 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 325 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Madden of Nantucket and Senator Murray, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Timothy R. Madden, David T. Vieira and Therese Murray that the retirement board in the town of Falmouth be authorized to acquire property and equipment and employ personnel for the administration of the retirement system of said town. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the Falmouth Retirement Board to acquire real property in the town of Falmouth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 325 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-11-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-11-05 | House | Again enacted |
2012-11-05 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-11-05 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-11-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-11-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-11-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2012-11-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-11-01 | House | Enacted |
2012-10-30 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-10-25 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2012-10-25 | House | Bills in the Third Reading discharge report accepted |
2012-10-25 | House | Read third |
2012-08-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-08-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-08-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-08-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-07-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2012-07-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4317 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119224&generalCourtId=1 |