MA H4328 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1386
Note: Legislation replaced by H5104
Note: Legislation replaced by H5104
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-8-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to accelerating improvements to the local and regional public health system to address disparities in the delivery of public health services
Title
Relative to accelerating improvements to the local and regional public health system to address disparities in the delivery of public health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | House | New draft substituted, see H5104 |
2022-07-28 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2022-07-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-07-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H5104 |
2022-05-02 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-01-13 | House | New draft of S1386 and H2329 |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1386 (Replaces) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4328
H2329 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4328
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1203 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H5104 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5179 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - See H5104
S1429 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H2586 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2329 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4328
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1203 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H5104 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5179 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - See H5104
S1429 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H2586 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4328 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4328.pdf |