MA S1386 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4328
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to accelerate improvements to the local and regional public health system to address disparities in the delivery of public health services. Public Health.
Title
Relative to accelerating improvements to the local and regional public health system to address disparities in the delivery of public health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4328 |
2021-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1461 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4328 (Replaced by) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5104
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1461 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4328 (Replaced by) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5104
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1386 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1386.pdf |