MA H4338 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3320
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the department of capital asset management and maintenance to lease certain land in the town of Hull to The Friends of the Paragon Carousel, Inc.
Title
Authorizing the department of capital asset management and maintenance to lease certain land in the town of Hull to The Friends of the Paragon Carousel, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-07-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-23 | House | New draft of H3320 |
2014-07-23 | House | Pending new draft of H3320 |
2014-07-23 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3320 (Replaces) 2014-07-23 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means), see H4338
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4338 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4338.pdf |