MA H4341 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Patrick Laughlin, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Patrick Laughlin, an employee of the Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-07-18 | House | Enacted |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-18 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2021-12-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H62 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4523 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2022
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H2775 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4523 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2022
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H2775 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4341 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4341.pdf |