MA H4352 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3118
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 283 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 283 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Framingham be authorized to establish the Framingham economic development corporation. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing the Framingham Economic Development Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 283 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-11-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-11-23 | House | Enacted |
2022-11-21 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2022-09-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-09-26 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-26 | Senate | New text (Spilka) substituted, see S3118 |
2022-09-26 | Senate | Read third |
2022-09-26 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-13 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-05-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-04-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/17/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H3870 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4125
H4084 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2021
H4125 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4252
H4660 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - New draft substituted, see H5095
S2852 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2022
S3118 (Replaced by) 2022-09-26 - See H4352
H4252 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2022
H4084 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2021
H4125 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4252
H4660 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - New draft substituted, see H5095
S2852 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2022
S3118 (Replaced by) 2022-09-26 - See H4352
H4252 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4352 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4352.pdf |