MA H4359 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-24 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-24 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a snowmobile educational safety program
Title
Establishing a snowmobile educational safety program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-24 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-12-20 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-08-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-08-02 | House | Substituted for H3941 |
2012-07-31 | House | Recommended new draft for H3941 |
2012-07-31 | House | Reported from the House committee on Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4359 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119669&generalCourtId=1 |