MA H4366 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5045
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - New draft substituted, see H5045
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - New draft substituted, see H5045
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Messrs. Donato of Medford and Ultrino of Malden, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Paul J. Donato, Steven Ultrino and Kate Lipper-Garabedian that the Commissioner of the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey certain property in the city of Malden to said city. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management to convey certain property in the city of Malden to the city of Malden
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | House | New draft substituted, see H5045 |
2022-07-20 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-07-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2022-07-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-07-20 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H5045 |
2022-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | House | Recommitted to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2022-03-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-03-24 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2022-02-10 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 02/18/2022 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-02-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/17/2022 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2022 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H4237 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4900
H4126 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2022
H3994 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4902
H5045 (Replaced by) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H4237 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4900
H4126 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2022
H3994 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4902
H5045 (Replaced by) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4366 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4366.pdf |