MA H5045 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4366
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain property in the city of Malden to the city of Malden
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain property in the city of Malden to the city of Malden
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-07-28 | House | Enacted |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-28 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-20 | House | New draft of H4366 |
2022-07-20 | House | Pending new draft of H4366 |
2022-07-20 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4366 (Replaces) 2022-07-20 - New draft substituted, see H5045
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H4237 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4900
H4126 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2022
H3994 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4902
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H4237 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4900
H4126 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2022
H3994 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4902
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5045 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5045.pdf |