MA H4374 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4453
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Littleton be authorized to grant one additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Littleton to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4453 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4453 (Replaced by) 2016-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 335 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4374 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4374.pdf |