MA H4376 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1920
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the cost of veteran higher education
Title
Relative to the cost of veteran higher education
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-23 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2018-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-04-09 | House | New draft of H1920 |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported from the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1920 (Replaces) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4376
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H4519 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H4519 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4376 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4376.pdf |