MA H4388 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Muradian of Grafton and Senator Moore, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of David K. Muradian, Jr. and Michael O. Moore that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to grant certain easements in the town of Grafton to the New England Power Company. House Rules.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant certain easements in the town of Grafton to the New England Power Company
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 216 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Enacted - see Roll Call #595 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2016-07-31 | House | Enacted 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 505) |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-28 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-14 | House | House concurred |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday July 15, 2016) adopted, pending concurrence |
2016-07-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, July 15, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-06-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2016 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2016-05-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2626 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2625 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2377 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2376 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2627 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2625 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2377 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2376 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2627 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4388 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4388.pdf |