MA H4389 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4258
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 234 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 234 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Town of Hopkinton to establish a means-tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Title
Authorizing the Town of Hopkinton to establish a means-tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 234 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-08-13 | House | Enacted |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-06-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-09 | House | New draft of H4258 |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4258 (Replaces) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H1538 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H1538 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4389 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4389.pdf |