MA H817 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to penalties for crimes against seniors. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to penalties for crimes against seniors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1999 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
S797 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S805 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1538 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
S797 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S805 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1538 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H817 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H817.pdf |