MA S805 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to archaic crimes. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to archaic crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S450 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2382
S150 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S997 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S958 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1026 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1999 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1008 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H803 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H884 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2342 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H885 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H737 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2575 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S150 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S997 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S958 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1026 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1999 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1008 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H803 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H884 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2342 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H885 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H737 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2575 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S805 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S805.pdf |