MA H4404 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the town of Northfield Board of Sewer Commissioners from three to five members. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Increasing the town of Northfield Board of Sewer Commissioners from three to five members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-20 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-05-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2024 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4048
H4048 (Similar To) 2023-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2023
H4687 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4048 (Similar To) 2023-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2023
H4687 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4404 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4404.pdf |