MA H4412 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4033
Note: Legislation replaced by H4926
Note: Legislation replaced by H4926
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - New draft substituted, see H4926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - New draft substituted, see H4926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create the Leo M. Birmingham Parkway Trust Fund
Title
To create the Leo M. Birmingham Parkway Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | New draft substituted, see H4926 |
2020-07-31 | House | New draft substituted, see H4926 |
2020-07-31 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2020-07-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4926 |
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-02-13 | House | New draft of H4033 |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4033 (Replaces) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4412
H4926 (Replaced by) 2020-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2020
H4926 (Replaced by) 2020-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4412 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4412.pdf |