MA H4436 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H629
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the public safety on urban college campuses
Title
Relative to the public safety on urban college campuses
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-23 | House | New draft of H629 |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H629 (Replaces) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4436
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2532 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2532 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4436.pdf |