MA H445 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4587
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand access to computer science coursework in public schools. Education.
Title
To expand access to computer science coursework
Sponsors
Rep. Manny Cruz [D] | Rep. Andres Vargas [D] | Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Rep. Christopher Markey [D] |
Rep. Russell Holmes [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4587 |
2023-10-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1260 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H2605 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
H3227 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H3992 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4503
H4058 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4879
H4587 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2605 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
H3227 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H3992 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4503
H4058 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4879
H4587 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H445 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H445.pdf |