MA H4465 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Somerville be authorized to continue the employment of Charles J. Femino as acting chief of police in said city. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Somerville to continue the employment of Charles J. Femino as acting chief of police
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4649 |
2024-05-16 | House | Read third |
2024-05-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2370 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2023
H4074 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
S2545 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
H4649 (Replaced by) 2024-05-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2024
H4074 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
S2545 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
H4649 (Replaced by) 2024-05-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4465 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4465.pdf |