MA H4467 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4794
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to products used on newborn infants. Public Health.
Title
Relative to newborn infant products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4794 |
2018-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Concurred |
2018-05-17 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S1197 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H4794 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S1197 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H4794 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4467 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4467.pdf |