MA H4481 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Orleans be authorized to adopt a pesticide reduction bylaw in said town. Environment and Natural Resources. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Orleans to adopt a pesticide reduction bylaw
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4481 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4481.pdf |