MA H450 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4880
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to notification to licensees of applications for the sale of alcoholic beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to notification of licensees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4880 |
2021-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3861 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
S204 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
S204 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H450.pdf |