MA H4520 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4436
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To modernize civil service laws
Title
To modernize civil service laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-04-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2024-04-08 | House | New draft of H4436 |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4436 (Replaces) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4520
H2654 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Reporting date extended to Thursday October 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H2654 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Reporting date extended to Thursday October 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4520 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4520.pdf |