MA H4545 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3698). March 5, 2020.
Title
To dissolve the Newburyport Redevelopment Authority and transfer its lands to the city of Newburyport
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #192 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 177 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 177 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #192 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2020-06-04 | House | Enacted - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 177) |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-03-05 | House | Substituted for H3698 |