MA H4551 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 439 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 439 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the charter of the town of Southbridge (House, No. 3900).
Title
Making corrective changes to certain amendments to the town of Southbridge charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 439 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-28 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-27 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-27 | House | Substituted for H3900 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4551 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=120993&generalCourtId=1 |