MA H4557 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4318
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Milford to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be consumed on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Milford to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be consumed on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-05-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-05-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-05-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-03-12 | House | New draft of H4318 |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4318 (Replaces) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4557
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4557 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4557.pdf |