MA H4318 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Milford be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premise. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Milford to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be consumed on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4557 |
2020-02-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/10/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4557 (Replaced by) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4318 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4318.pdf |