MA H4558 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1846
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a commission to study the need to reduce salt and sugar content in meals served in restaurants, schools, and public spaces
Title
Creating a commission to study the need to reduce salt and sugar content in meals served in restaurants, schools, and public spaces
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-03-12 | House | New draft of H1846 |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1846 (Replaces) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4558
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4558 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4558.pdf |