MA H4568 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
ESTABLISHING THE MASSACHUSETTS FOOD POLICY COUNCIL
Title
ESTABLISHING THE MASSACHUSETTS FOOD POLICY COUNCIL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-07-30 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-30 | Enacted | |
2010-07-29 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | |
2010-07-29 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-13 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-12 | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-12 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-12 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment | |
2010-05-13 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-05-10 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-03-18 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-18 | Substituted for H4255 | |
2010-03-18 | Pending new draft for H4255 | |
2010-03-18 | Reported from the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h04568.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht04/ht04568.htm |