MA H459 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3722
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing an educational mandate task force (including members of the General Court) to review all existing state mandates imposed on public schools and districts in the Commonwealth. Education.
Title
Establishing an educational mandate task force
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Peisch [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] |
Rep. Denise Garlick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3722 |
2013-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3722 (Replaced by) 2013-10-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H459 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H459.pdf |