MA H4595 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on August 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-29 - Recommended new text for S2461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-29 - Recommended new text for S2461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To strengthen the anti-human trafficking law
Title
To strengthen the anti-human trafficking law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-29 | House | Recommended new text for S2461 |
2016-08-29 | House | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1972 (Similar To) 2015-09-24 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #168 (YEAS 34 - NAYS 4)
S2074 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2360 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2356 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2306 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2074 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2360 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2356 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2306 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4595 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4595.pdf |