MA H4605 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1174
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the right to time off for voting
Title
Protecting the right to time off for voting
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development | Rep. John Lawn [D] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Richard Haggerty [D] |
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] | Rep. Steven Owens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-04-04 | House | New draft of S1174 and H2011 |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1174 (Replaces) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H2011 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S458 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S473 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S474 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H828 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H74 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2011 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S458 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S473 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S474 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H828 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H74 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4605 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4605.pdf |