MA H461 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to directing the Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to include the history of working people and the labor movement in the United States in its academic standards. Education.
Title
Relative to teaching the history of working people
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H582 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H459 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S287 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S276 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H459 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S287 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S276 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H461 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H461.pdf |