MA H4619 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1772
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-31 | House | New draft of S1772 |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1772 (Replaces) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S2132 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2266 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H2750 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H5116 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Governor's amendment adopted
S2132 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2266 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H2750 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H5116 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Governor's amendment adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4619 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4619.pdf |