MA S2132 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to institute a governance structure for Mass Save. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Instituting a governance structure for Mass Save
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-06-15 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S2266 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H2750 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4619 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5116 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Governor's amendment adopted
S2080 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2266 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H2750 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4619 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5116 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Governor's amendment adopted
S2080 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2132 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2132.pdf |