MA H4624 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery to make an investigation and study of certain House documents concerning mental health, substance use and recovery
Title
Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-18 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2018-06-18 | House | Accompanied by H1062, H1068, H2392, H2394, H2395, H2397, H2402, H2408, H2412, H3207 and H3593 |
2018-06-18 | House | Reported from the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1062 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1068 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2392 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2394 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2395 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2397 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2402 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2408 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2412 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H3207 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H3593 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H4537 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4502 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4625 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4591 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4610 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4632 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4641 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4672 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4685 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4678 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4706 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4723 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4740 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4743 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1068 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2392 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2394 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2395 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2397 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2402 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2408 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2412 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H3207 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H3593 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H4537 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4502 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4625 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4591 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4610 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4632 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4641 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4672 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4685 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4678 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4706 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4723 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4740 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4743 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4624 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4624.pdf |