MA H463 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4406
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure that each student enrolled in a school district is screened for potential indicators of dyslexia or other reading disabilities. Education.
Title
Relative to providing screening for dyslexia
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Peisch [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Louis Kafka [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4406 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4406 (Replaced by) 2016-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H460 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
H460 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H463 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H463.pdf |