MA H4645 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H597
Note: Legislation replaced by H5222
Note: Legislation replaced by H5222
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reimbursement of school-based care
Title
Relative to the reimbursement of school-based care
Sponsors
House Committee on Education | Rep. Denise Garlick [D] | Rep. James Murphy [D] | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] |
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5222 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-25 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-04-11 | House | New draft of H597 and H669 |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H597 (Replaces) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4645
H669 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4645
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H669 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4645
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4645 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4645.pdf |