MA H4681 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3465
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving emergency access to mental health services.
Title
Improving emergency access to mental health services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-07-30 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-30 | Enacted 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Yea and Nay in Supplement, | |
2010-07-30 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-30 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-30 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2010-07-07 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-07-06 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-06-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-06-15 | New draft of H3465 | |
2010-05-20 | Pending new text for H3465 | |
2010-05-20 | Reported from the committee on Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H3465 (Replaces) 2010-06-15 - New draft substituted, see H4681
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H4681 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8679&generalCourtId=2 |